UT SB0211 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Tax Administrative Remedies Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Administrative Remedies Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2019-03-20 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2019-03-20SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2019-03-20SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2019-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2019-03-14 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-03-14 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-03-13 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-03-13SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2019-03-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2019-03-13SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2019-03-13HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2019-03-13HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar
2019-03-11HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar
2019-03-11HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-03-08HouseHouse Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-03-08HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-03-07HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-03-06HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-03-06HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2019-03-06HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2019-03-06HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2019-03-06SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2019-03-01SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2019-03-01SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-03-01SenateSenate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-03-01SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-02-27SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-02-27SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee
2019-02-27SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee
2019-02-25SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-02-25SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-02-25 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-02-25 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-02-25 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback