UT SB0211 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water Rights Amendments
Title
Water Rights Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2014-03-11 | House | House/ circled in H3RDSB |
2014-03-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-11 | House | House/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2014-03-07 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-03-07 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-06 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-06 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTGOP |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTGOP |
2014-02-21 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTGOP |
2014-02-21 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTGOP |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |