UT SB0210 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Paid Leave Modifications
Title
Paid Leave Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-01 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63J | 1 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 19 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |