UT SB0209 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Grants for Personal Mobile Learning Devices
Title
Grants for Personal Mobile Learning Devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTEDU |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTEDU |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTEDU |
2013-02-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTEDU |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTEDU |
2013-02-22 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTEDU |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-19 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |