UT SB0207 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer Protection Amendments
Title
Consumer Protection Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - House/ failed (Y: 25 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 7 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 7 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ motion to reconsider in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ failed in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business
Commerce and Trade
Consumer Protection
Department of Commerce
Department of Human Services
Fines
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Mental Health
Punishment
Repair and Maintenance Services
Substance Abuse and Mental Health
Suicide
Commerce and Trade
Consumer Protection
Department of Commerce
Department of Human Services
Fines
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Mental Health
Punishment
Repair and Maintenance Services
Substance Abuse and Mental Health
Suicide
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 41 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 41 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 41 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62A | 15 | 1103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |