UT SB0207 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Exemption for Cedar Band of Paiute Tribe
Title
Tax Exemption for Cedar Band of Paiute Tribe
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTREV | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV | |
2010-02-19 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-18 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0207.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/sbillint/sb0207.pdf |