UT SB0204 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permitting Amendments
Title
Permitting Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-28 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-25 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-25 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Procedures
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Business Licensing
Counties
Local Government Infrastructure and Utilities
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Business Licensing
Counties
Local Government Infrastructure and Utilities
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)