UT SB0198 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Division of Housing and Community Development Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Division of Housing and Community Development Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-22 Governor Signed in LTGOV
2011-03-17 Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2011-03-16 Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2011-03-08 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2011-03-08 Senate/ received from House in SPRES
2011-03-08 House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2011-03-08 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2011-03-07 House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB
2011-03-01 House/ received from Senate in HINTRO
2011-02-28 Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2011-02-28 Senate/ circled in S3RD
2011-02-28 Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2011-02-25 Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2011-02-22 Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTWED
2011-02-22 Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTWED
2011-02-22 Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTWED
2011-02-17 Senate/ to standing committee in SSTWED
2011-02-17 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2011-02-16 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2011-02-05 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC
2011-02-04 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback