UT SB0198 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Economic Development Incentive Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development Incentive Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-19 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2010-03-18 Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2010-03-16 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2010-03-11 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2010-03-11 House/ to Senate in SPRES
2010-03-11 House/ passed 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2010-03-09 House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB
2010-03-08 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2010-03-05 Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK
2010-03-05 Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND
2010-03-01 Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in S2ND
2010-02-26 Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2010-02-25 Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTWED
2010-02-23 Senate/ to standing committee in SSTWED
2010-02-22 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2010-02-22 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2010-02-05 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC
2010-02-05 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback