UT SB0194 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Main Street Program
Title
Utah Main Street Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 45 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-11 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-03 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-03 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-24 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-24 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-12 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Boards and Committees
Economic Development
Government Operations (State Issues)
Governor's Office of Economic Development
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Economic Development
Government Operations (State Issues)
Governor's Office of Economic Development
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)