UT SB0190 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Cannabis Act Amendments
Title
Medical Cannabis Act Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Evan Vickers [R] | Rep. Joel Ferry [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 5 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 5 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-08 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-04 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-03-03 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 5 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-22 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-22 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 4 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 3 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture and Food
Department of Agriculture and Food
Department of Health
Health
Medical Cannabis
Agriculture and Food
Department of Agriculture and Food
Department of Health
Health
Medical Cannabis
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 41 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 41 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 41 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 41 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 4 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |