UT SB0189 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco Retailer Amendments
Title
Tobacco Retailer Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Evan Vickers [R] | Rep. Paul Ray [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-11 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-09 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 4 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business Licensing
Counties
Crimes
Department of Health
Electronic Cigarettes
Health
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Tobacco and Other Nicotine Products
Counties
Crimes
Department of Health
Electronic Cigarettes
Health
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Tobacco and Other Nicotine Products
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 8 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 50 | 333 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 62 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 62 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 62 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 62 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 62 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 62 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 10 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |