UT SB0189 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Temporary Land Use Regulation Amendments
Title
Temporary Land Use Regulation Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Comm - Held in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-05 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-02-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |