UT SB0178 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Emergency Medical Services System Act Amendments
Title
Utah Emergency Medical Services System Act Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Ray [R] | Sen. Dennis Stowell [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2010-03-10 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-09 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-03-09 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-09 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-08 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-03 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-03 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-02 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-03-02 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-17 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-17 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-12 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |