UT SB0173 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic Beverage Control Act Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverage Control Act Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-17 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2023-03-13 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2023-03-13SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2023-03-10SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2023-03-10SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2023-03-06 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-06 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-03 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-03SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2023-03-03SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2023-03-03SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2023-03-03HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2023-03-03HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2023-03-03HouseSenate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker
2023-03-03SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Concurrence Calendar
2023-03-03SenateSenate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar
2023-03-03SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2023-03-02SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Secretary
2023-03-02SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2023-03-02SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2023-03-02HouseHouse/ substituted from # 3 to # 5 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-03-02HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-03-02HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-03-02HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-03-02HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-03-02HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-02-28HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2023-02-28HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2023-02-27HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2023-02-27HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2023-02-27SenateSenate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-27SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-27SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-27SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-24SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-24SenateSenate/ substituted from # 1 to # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-24SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-21SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-21SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-21SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-21SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2023-02-21SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2023-02-21SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2023-02-16SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2023-02-09SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee
2023-02-03SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2023-02-03SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2023-02-02 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2023-02-02 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32B1102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B1202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B1206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B1304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B1603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B1606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B1608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B1703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B1705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B11209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B11210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B11609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B12302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B17102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B18204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B18205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B2202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B2303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B4202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B4418Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B5304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B5309Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B61005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B6203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B6205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B6206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B6305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B6403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B6404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B6406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B6503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B6603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B6605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B6905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B7409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B8401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B9202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62A15401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2232Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/SB0173.html
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0173.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0173S01.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0173S03.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillamd/SB0173S03.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0173S05.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillenr/SB0173.pdf
Amendmenthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/pamend/sb0173s03.sfa.01.pdf
Amendmenthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/pamend/sb0173s03.sfap.01.pdf
Amendmenthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/pamend/sb0173s04.hfa.01.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0173.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0173S01_ComparedWith_SB0173.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0173S02_ComparedWith_SB0173.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0173S03_ComparedWith_SB0173S02.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0173S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0173S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0173S03.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0173S04_ComparedWith_SB0173.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0173S05_ComparedWith_SB0173S04.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0173S04.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0173S05.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=27562
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=27563
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=1328&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=1417&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=1474&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=1959&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback