UT SB0173 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Business Entity Amendments
Title
Business Entity Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-16 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2010-03-04 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-03-04 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-04 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2010-03-01 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-26 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-23 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON | |
2010-02-18 | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-16 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-12 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-11 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-10 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Business
Corporations
Criminal Code
Division of Corporations and Commercial Code
Limited Liability Company
Corporations
Criminal Code
Division of Corporations and Commercial Code
Limited Liability Company