UT SB0170 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspension of Driving Privileges
Title
Suspension of Driving Privileges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-19 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2010-03-10 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-03-10 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-10 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-09 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-25 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-23 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |