UT SB0168 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commission for Student-centered Public Education Amendments
Title
Commission for Student-centered Public Education Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 1 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-02 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-02 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Boards and Committees
Education
K-12 Education
School Accountability
Standards and Curriculum
State Board of Education
Education
K-12 Education
School Accountability
Standards and Curriculum
State Board of Education