UT SB0163 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kindergarten Amendments
Title
Kindergarten Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-10 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Education Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Education Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Education Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Education Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House Education Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Education Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Education Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-01 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-01 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-01 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Education Committee |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-02-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |