UT SB0163 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Status Verification System Amendments
Title
Status Verification System Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Mayne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL |
2013-02-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL |
2013-02-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-01 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0163.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/sbillint/sb0163.pdf |