UT SB0157 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Citizen Advisory Boards
Title
Citizen Advisory Boards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Counties
Department of Public Safety
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Municipalities
Peace Officers
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Safety
Department of Public Safety
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Municipalities
Peace Officers
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Safety