UT SB0157 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Vehicle Dealer Franchise Amendments
Title
Motor Vehicle Dealer Franchise Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-09 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2010-03-09 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-09 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-03-09 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-09 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-08 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-08 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-08 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-05 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2010-03-05 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-24 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-19 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |