UT SB0155S01 | 2013 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation SB0155

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Postadoption Contact Agreements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postadoption Contact Agreements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-01 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2013-03-20 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2013-03-20SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2013-03-19SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2013-03-19SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2013-03-14 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2013-03-13 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-13 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-13SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2013-03-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2013-03-13SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2013-03-13HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR
2013-03-13HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2013-03-12HouseHouse/ 1st & 2nd readings/ suspension in H3RDSB
2013-03-12HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB
2013-03-08HouseHouse/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in HSTRUL
2013-03-08HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB
2013-03-08HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTJUD
2013-03-07HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTJUD
2013-03-01HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTJUD
2013-02-28HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2013-02-28HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2013-02-28HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2013-02-28HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK
2013-02-28SenateSenate/ 1st, 2nd, & 3rd readings/ suspension in S3RD
2013-02-28SenateSenate/ uncircled in S3RD
2013-02-27SenateSenate/ circled in S3RD
2013-02-27SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2013-02-26SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2013-02-26SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2013-02-19SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2013-02-19SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTJLC
2013-02-19SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTJLC
2013-02-16SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC
2013-02-15SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTJLC
2013-02-14SenateBill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC
2013-02-14SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC
2013-02-14SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTJLC
2013-02-12SenateLFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTJLC
2013-02-05SenateSenate Comm - Held in SSTJLC
2013-02-05SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTJLC
2013-02-01SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC
2013-01-31SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2013-01-31SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2013-01-30 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2013-01-30 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

SB0155 (Replaces) 2013-02-19 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback