UT SB0155 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ to Senate in SSEC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ to Senate in SSEC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enhanced Penalties for HIV Positive Offender Amendments
Title
Enhanced Penalties for HIV Positive Offender Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-03-08 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-03 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-03 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SCON | |
2010-02-26 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SCON | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in SSTHHS | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTHHS | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-23 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |