UT SB0154 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Postconviction Remedies Act Amendments
Title
Postconviction Remedies Act Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-17 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-12 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0154.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/sbillint/sb0154.pdf |