UT SB0147S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0147
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' Compensation and Occupational Safety Related Amendments
Title
Workers' Compensation and Occupational Safety Related Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-20 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-04 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-04 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2013-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-04 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ 3rd reading in HCON |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HCON |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTBUS |
2013-02-27 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-02-27 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-02-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS |
2013-02-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-22 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-02-22 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-02-22 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SCON |
2013-02-19 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SCON |
2013-02-19 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SCON |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSTEDW |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTEDW |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTEDW |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDW |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTEDW |
2013-02-14 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTEDW |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTEDW |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTEDW |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTEDW |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDW |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-01-29 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0147 (Replaces) 2013-02-19 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB