UT SB0142 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ballot Delivery Amendments
Title
Ballot Delivery Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Nate Blouin [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-26 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Election Administration
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Voting and Voter Registration
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Voting and Voter Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20A | 1 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 5 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |