UT SB0136S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0136
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Elections Amendments
Title
Local Elections Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2014-03-20 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-18 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-17 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-14 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-14 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in SCURCAL |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ circled in SCURCAL |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ substituted in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2014-03-10 | House | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in H3RDSB |
2014-03-10 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in HSTRUL |
2014-03-06 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL |
2014-03-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTGOC |
2014-03-06 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC |
2014-02-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-26 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTREV |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTREV |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTREV |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTREV |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTREV |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0136 (Replaces) 2014-03-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Subjects
Elections
Government Operations (State Issues)
Initiatives / Referendums
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Government Operations (State Issues)
Initiatives / Referendums
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)