UT SB0133 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Severance Tax Revenue Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Severance Tax Revenue Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2021-03-22 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2021-03-15 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2021-03-15SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2021-03-15SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2021-03-15SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-03-04 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-04 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-24 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-24SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2021-02-24SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2021-02-24SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2021-02-24HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2021-02-24HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-02-23HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-02-23HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-23HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-19HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-18HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-02-18HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-02-18HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2021-02-18HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2021-02-18SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2021-02-12SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2021-02-12SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substitute/ amended/ Consent Cal in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-12SenateSenate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-12SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-12SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-12SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-10SenateSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-10SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-04SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-01SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-27SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-27SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-26 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-26 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
519202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
519301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
595115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
595116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
595119Amended CodeSee Bill Text
595215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I1263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63J1602Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/SB0133.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0133.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0133S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillamd/SB0133S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillenr/SB0133.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/sb0133s01.sca.01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0133.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0133.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0133S01_ComparedWith_SB0133.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0133S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0133S01.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19557
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19558
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19559
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19561
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=622&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20087
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=708&house=H

Bill Comments 750

feedback