UT SB0123 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DUI Modifications
Title
DUI Modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-22 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-22 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Crimes
Driver License
Driving Under the Influence (DUI)
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Roads/Highways
Transportation
Driver License
Driving Under the Influence (DUI)
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Roads/Highways
Transportation
Code Citations
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/SB0123.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0123.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0123.pna.pdf |