UT SB0122S01 | 2013 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation SB0122

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Student Leadership Skills Development

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Leadership Skills Development

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ refused to recede from House amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 51 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House/ failed (Y: 37 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-01 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2013-03-21 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2013-03-21SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2013-03-21SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2013-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2013-03-19 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2013-03-14 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-14 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SPRES
2013-03-14SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2013-03-14SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2013-03-14HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2013-03-14HouseSenate/ to House in HSPKR
2013-03-14HouseSenate Conference Committee - Final Passage in HSPKR
2013-03-14 Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in CONCOM
2013-03-14 Senate/ received from House in CONCOM
2013-03-14 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in CONCOM
2013-03-14 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in CONCOM
2013-03-14 House/ to Senate in CONCOM
2013-03-14 House Conference Committee - Final Passage in CONCOM
2013-03-14 House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in CONCOM
2013-03-14 Bill Substituted by Conference Committee in CONCOM
2013-03-14 House/ received from Senate in CONCOM
2013-03-14 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in CONCOM
2013-03-14 Senate/ to House in CONCOM
2013-03-14 Senate Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM
2013-03-14 Senate/ received from House in CONCOM
2013-03-14 House/ to Senate in CONCOM
2013-03-14 House Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM
2013-03-14HouseHouse/ refused to recede from House amendment in HCLERK
2013-03-14HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2013-03-14HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2013-03-14HouseSenate/ refuse to concur with House amendments in HCLERK
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ received from House in SSEC
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSEC
2013-03-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2013-03-13SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2013-03-13HouseHouse/ floor amendment in H3RDSB
2013-03-13HouseHouse/ motion to reconsider in HCLERK
2013-03-13HouseHouse/ failed in HCLERK
2013-03-13HouseHouse/ floor amendment in H3RDSB
2013-03-13HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2013-03-12HouseHouse/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB
2013-03-12HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB
2013-02-15HouseHouse/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in HSTRUL
2013-02-15HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB
2013-02-15HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in HSTEDU
2013-02-14HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDU
2013-02-13HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTEDU
2013-02-12HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2013-02-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2013-02-12HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2013-02-12HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2013-02-12SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2013-02-11SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2013-02-11SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2013-02-07SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2013-02-07SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTEDU
2013-02-06SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU
2013-02-06SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTEDU
2013-01-28SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU
2013-01-28SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2013-01-16SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2013-01-02 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2013-01-02 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

SB0122 (Replaces) 2013-03-14 - Bill Substituted by Conference Committee in HSUB

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0122S01.htm
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/sbillint/sb0122s01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/sbillenr/sb0122.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2013GS&voteid=2053&sequence=27620
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=290&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=316&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2013GS&voteid=2277&sequence=27631
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1075&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1076&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1140&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1143&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1688&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1183&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1208&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1765&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1766&house=S&sessionid=2013GS

Bill Comments

feedback