UT SB0120 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Business and Labor Committee
Hearing: Feb 25 @ 8:00 am in Room 215 Senate Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Vehicle Repair and Notification Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Repair and Notification Amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-14SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-14SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2020-02-13SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee
2020-02-12SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee
2020-02-11SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-02-11SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-02-11 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-02-11 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-02-11 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback