UT SB0120 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disarming a Peace Officer Amendment
Title
Disarming a Peace Officer Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-19 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2010-03-03 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-03-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-03 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-01 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-25 | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-24 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-11 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-05 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-02 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-01 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-29 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |