UT SB0118 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

State School Board Candidate Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State School Board Candidate Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Tabled (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2021-02-17SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-16SenateSenate Comm - Not Lifted from Table in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-09SenateSenate Comm - Tabled in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-09SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-04SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-01-25SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-24SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-22SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-22SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-21 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-21 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-21 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20A9408Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback