UT SB0118 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Probate Code Amendments
Title
Uniform Probate Code Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Lyle Hillyard [R] | Rep. Kay McIff [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-11 | House/ passed 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-09 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-08 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-03 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-01 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-12 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-05 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-03 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-01 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-29 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-01-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |