UT SB0116 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Garnishment for Debt Collection

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Garnishment for Debt Collection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ filed in SFILE
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC
2013-03-08SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL
2013-03-06SenateSenate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTJLC
2013-02-05SenateSenate Comm - Held in SSTJLC
2013-02-04SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTJLC
2013-02-01SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC
2013-02-01SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTJLC
2013-01-28SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC
2013-01-28SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2013-01-25SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2013-01-23 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2013-01-23 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2013-01-23 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback