UT SB0106 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sexual Exploitation Amendments
Title
Sexual Exploitation Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-02-17 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-15 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-15 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-02-15 | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR | |
2011-02-11 | Senate/ received from House in SSEC | |
2011-02-11 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-02-08 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2011-02-07 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2011-02-07 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2011-02-02 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-02 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-02-02 | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON | |
2011-01-28 | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTJLC | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2011-01-24 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-22 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SINTRO | |
2011-01-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SINTRO | |
2011-01-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |