UT SB0106 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Vehicle Noise Emission Standards
Title
Motor Vehicle Noise Emission Standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSUB | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2010-01-28 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTTPT | |
2010-01-28 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTTPT | |
2010-01-27 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0106.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/sbillint/sb0106.pdf |