UT SB0103 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer Alcoholic Beverage Purchasing
Title
Consumer Alcoholic Beverage Purchasing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Business and Labor Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |