UT SB0102 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Restricting the Movement of a Motor Vehicle
Title
Restricting the Movement of a Motor Vehicle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 10 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 10 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-25 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-02-24 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-02-24 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-02-23 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-17 | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-16 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2010-02-12 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-12 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2010-02-09 | Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-09 | Senate/ motion to reconsider in SSEC | |
2010-02-09 | Senate/ failed in SSEC | |
2010-02-03 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-03 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTTPT | |
2010-01-28 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTTPT | |
2010-01-27 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |