UT SB0098 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Paraeducator Funding

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Paraeducator Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-14 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ filed in SFILE
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ received from House in SSEC
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK
2014-02-18HouseHouse/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in HSTRUL
2014-02-18HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB
2014-02-18HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in HSTEDU
2014-02-14HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDU
2014-02-13HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTEDU
2014-02-12HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2014-02-12HouseSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK
2014-02-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2014-02-12HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2014-02-12HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2014-02-12SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S3RD
2014-02-12SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2014-02-12SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S3RD
2014-02-11SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2014-02-11SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2014-02-07SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2014-02-07SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTEDU
2014-02-05SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU
2014-02-05SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTEDU
2014-01-29SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU
2014-01-27SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2014-01-21SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in SINTRO
2014-01-06 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC
2014-01-03 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2013-10-03 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2013-10-03 LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback