UT SB0096 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Political Subdivisions Employment Revisions
Title
Political Subdivisions Employment Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S3RD |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S3RD |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTGOP |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTGOP |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2013-02-05 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTGOP |
2013-02-05 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTGOP |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-01 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |