UT SB0093S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0093
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0093S02
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0093S02
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Internal Audit Amendments
Title
Internal Audit Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ circled in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in HSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTREV |
2014-03-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTREV |
2014-03-06 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-05 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSTGOP |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTGOP |
2014-02-13 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTGOP |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0093 (Replaces) 2014-02-25 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSUB
SB0093S02 (Replaced by) 2014-04-02 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
SB0093S02 (Replaced by) 2014-04-02 - Governor Signed in LTGOV