UT SB0091 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

School Accountability Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Accountability Amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2021-01-19SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-19SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-15SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-14SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-13 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-13 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-13 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53E3511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53E5204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53E5301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53E5306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53E5309Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53G5503Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback