UT SB0090S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0090
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Residency Amendments
Title
Residency Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Weiler [R] | Rep. Craig Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2014-03-20 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-25 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-24 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-24 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-02-21 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-02-21 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2014-02-21 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-02-21 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-21 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2014-02-20 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-20 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-20 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDSB |
2014-02-20 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-02-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-02-19 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTPOL |
2014-02-18 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPOL |
2014-02-14 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTPOL |
2014-02-14 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-02-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-02-13 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND |
2014-02-07 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND |
2014-02-07 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTGOP |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-06 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTGOP |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTGOP |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-01-31 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-31 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0090 (Replaces) 2014-02-07 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB