UT SB0086 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Drug Testing and Paraphernalia Amendments
Title
Drug Testing and Paraphernalia Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Plumb [D] | Rep. Steve Eliason [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-03-13 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-17 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-17 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-15 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2023-02-15 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2023-02-15 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2023-02-15 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2023-02-15 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-10 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-10 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-02 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-01 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Controlled Substances
Crimes
Health
Human Services
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Public Safety
Punishment
Substance Abuse
Crimes
Health
Human Services
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Public Safety
Punishment
Substance Abuse