UT SB0085 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Construction Trade Licensing Act Amendments
Title
Utah Construction Trade Licensing Act Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-16 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-01 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-25 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-02-25 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ received from House in SSEC | |
2010-02-24 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-02-24 | House/ uncircled in H3RDSB | |
2010-02-11 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-02-10 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-08 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-05 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-05 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2010-02-02 | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON | |
2010-02-01 | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTBUS | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTBUS | |
2010-01-25 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-14 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSEC | |
2010-01-14 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSEC | |
2010-01-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |