UT SB0083 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Partnerships for Healthy Communities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Partnerships for Healthy Communities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House/ failed (Y: 25 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2019-03-14SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2019-03-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2019-03-13HouseHouse/ failed in Clerk of the House
2019-03-13HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2019-03-13HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2019-03-13HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2019-03-13HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2019-03-12HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2019-03-12HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2019-02-20HouseHouse/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee
2019-02-20HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-19HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-15HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-14HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2019-02-13HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2019-02-13HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2019-02-13SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-02-12SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-02-12SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-02-04SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-02-04SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-01SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-01SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-28SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-28SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-01-28SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-01-26SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-01-26SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-01-25SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-01-21 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-01-21 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-01-21 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback