UT SB0074 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Park Highway Access Amendments
Title
State Park Highway Access Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-15 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-04 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-04 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2010-03-01 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2010-03-01 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTTRA | |
2010-02-25 | House/ to standing committee in HSTTRA | |
2010-02-24 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-11 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-08 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-08 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-03 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-02 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |