UT SB0066S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0066
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Referendum Revisions
Title
Referendum Revisions
Sponsors
Sen. Stuart Reid [R] | Sen. Don Ipson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ circled in H3RDSB |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ returned to Rules in HSTRUL |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTGOC |
2013-03-07 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTGOC |
2013-03-06 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTGOC |
2013-03-05 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTGOC |
2013-03-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTGOC |
2013-03-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTGOC |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-03-01 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S3RD |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S3RD |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in S3RD |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S3RD |
2013-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in S3RD |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S3RD |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S3RD |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S3RD |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTEDW |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDW |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTEDW |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTEDW |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDW |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-07 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0066 (Replaces) 2013-03-01 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB